+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 827 PN 970, FP
March 19, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 827 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor