+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 56
- Approved by the Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1334
- House concurred in Senate amendments (194-7)
- Re-reported as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (46-3)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (188-9)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 568-569
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 826 PN 2085, CONCUR
June 24, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 826 PN 2085, FINAL PASSAGE
April 29, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 826 PN 1491, FP
April 17, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 826 PN 1128, 2019 A670, CONKLIN
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor