+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1661
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (2)
October 6, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 820 PN 2279, FP
September 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 820 PN 1811, 2015 A2709, FARRY
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor