+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
September 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 813 PN 2010, FP
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor