+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 29, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 80
- Approved by the Governor
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 177-178
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
October 21, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 81 PN 4475, CONCUR
October 20, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 81 PN 4475, FINAL PASSAGE
February 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 81 PN 564, FP
February 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 81 PN 358, 2019 A93, CUTLER
February 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 81 PN 358, 2019 A56, RAPP
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor