+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 89
- Approved by the Governor
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (3)
July 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 806 PN 2948, CONCUR
July 12, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 806 PN 2948, FINAL PASSAGE
June 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 806 PN 1429, FP
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor