+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Veto No. 2
- Vetoed by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 377-383
- Third consideration and final passage (26-22)
- Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No.1843 (25-22)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Amended on third consideration
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1169-1180
- Third consideration and final passage (100-91)
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1081-1114
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (13)
May 9, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1843, FINAL PASSAGE
June 23, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1843, FP
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A1242, O'NEILL
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A1283, PASHINSKI
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A1211, ROEBUCK
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A2223, SAYLOR
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A1212, CARROLL
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A1222, ROEBUCK
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 805 PN 1424, 2015 A1226, HARKINS
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor