+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 340 - 343
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 803 PN 1024, FP
March 23, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 803 PN 935, 2021 A526, O'NEAL
March 23, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 803 PN 935, 2021 A511, KEEFER
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor