+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- In the House
- Veto No. 1
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 578-582
- Third consideration and final passage (28-21)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 714-721
- Final passage (111-85)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 690-694
- Third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 654
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 800 PN 1676, FINAL PASSAGE
May 7, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 800 PN 1676, FP
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 800 PN 964, 2019 A886, SAYLOR
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor