+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 18
- Approved by the Governor
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 603
- House concurred in Senate amendments (138-57)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 293
- Third consideration and final passage (43-6)
- Amended on third consideration (47-2)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Second consideration, with amendments
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (136-57)
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1067
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 794 PN 3162, CONCUR
April 11, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 794 PN 3162, FINAL PASSAGE
June 29, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 794 PN 1842, FP
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 794 PN 1562, 2015 A2056, GILLESPIE
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor