+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 557
- Third consideration and final passage (194-1)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Vote
April 11, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 791 PN 3024, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor