+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 54
- Approved by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (41-9)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration (43-7)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2187
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1008-1010, 1013-1015
- Final passage (199-0)
- Third consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 980-982
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (8)
June 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 786 PN 2242, CONCUR
June 26, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 786 PN 2242, FINAL PASSAGE
June 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 786 PN 2107, FP
June 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 786 PN 2063, 2019 A1846, MACKENZIE
June 10, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 786 PN 1983, 2019 A1691, MACKENZIE
June 10, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 786 PN 1983, 2019 A1693, MACKENZIE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor