+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 5, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (180-16)
- In the Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 506-507
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 15, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 763 PN 1328, FP
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor