+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 429-434
- Third consideration and final passage (120-81)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 395 - 396
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 754 PN 1141, FP
April 5, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 754 PN 768, 2021 A594, DAY
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor