+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On November 27, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 95
- Approved by the Governor
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 509
- Third consideration and final passage (193-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
November 19, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 754 PN 804, FINAL PASSAGE
April 10, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 754 PN 804, FP
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor