+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 64
- Approved by the Governor
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1191
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (193-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Votes (2)
November 16, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 753 PN 1052, FINAL PASSAGE
April 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 753 PN 1052, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor