+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 16
- Approved by the Governor
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On April 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On April 20, 2020 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 752 PN 802, FINAL PASSAGE
March 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 752 PN 802, FP
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor