+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 18, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 749-753
- Third consideration and final passage (166-26)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Remarks see House Journal Page 712-715
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION
- Reported with request to re-refer to EDUCATION
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 752 PN 1473, FP
May 6, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 752 PN 888, 2015 A1214, SAYLOR
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor