+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
May 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 743 PN 880, FP
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor