+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 428-445
- Third consideration and final passage (122-67)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 376-398
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (16)
April 5, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 1262, MOT TABLE, WHEATLEY
April 5, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 1262, FP
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A608, PETRARCA
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A609, PETRARCA
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A610, PETRARCA
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A628, PETRARCA
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A671, FRANKEL
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A663, STEPHENS
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A636, WHEATLEY
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A637, WHEATLEY
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A672, WHEATLEY
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A675, WHEATLEY
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A635, WHEATLEY
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A602, PETRARCA
April 4, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 807, 2017 A603, PETRARCA
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor