+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 35 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1125
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 502-503
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to HUMAN SERVICES
- Reported with request to re-refer to HUMAN SERVICES
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
June 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 1866, CONCUR
June 24, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 1866, Final Passage
April 20, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 741 PN 1153, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor