+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 13, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor