+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 31 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 742-743
- House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 377-378
- Amended on third consideration
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 615-616
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
June 27, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 723 PN 3155, CONCUR
June 22, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 723 PN 3155, Final Passage
May 5, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 723 PN 1312, FP
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor