+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 28, 2013 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2599
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (3)
November 13, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 710 PN 2599, FP
October 22, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 710 - Adopt Amendment A03985
October 22, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 710 - Report Bill As Amended
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor