+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 29, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 84
- Approved by the Governor
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 5, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
October 21, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 703 PN 3670, FINAL PASSAGE
May 18, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 703 PN 3670, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor