+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 696 PN 810, FP
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor