+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (193-0)
- In the Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 684 PN 697, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor