+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (123-71)
- Re-reported as committed
- Remarks see House Journal Page 803-810
- In the Senate
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 755
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
May 23, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 679 PN 730, FP
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor