+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 65
- Approved by the Governor
On July 15, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 931-933
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
July 14, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 672 PN 2004, FINAL PASSAGE
June 5, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 672 PN 2004, FP
June 4, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 672 PN 1813, 2019 A1609, STEPHENS
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor