+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 644
- In the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Vote
May 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 664 PN 766, FP
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor