+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 597-598
- Third consideration and final passage (172-23)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 571
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 634 PN 1493, FP
April 17, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 634 PN 1376, 2019 A789, NEILSON
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor