+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 64
- Approved by the Governor
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1035-1036
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 697-698
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 752
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 695-696
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
July 7, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 632 PN 4052, CONCUR
June 30, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 632 PN 4052, FINAL PASSAGE
May 7, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 632 PN 1739, FP
May 6, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 632 PN 627, 2019 A950, CARROLL
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor