+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 774
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 744
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Votes (5)
June 16, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 623 PN 3722, FP
June 11, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 623 PN 1209, 2013 A7586, PETRI
June 11, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 623 PN 1209, 2013 A6366, SCHREIBER
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor