+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Vote
May 11, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 619 PN 689, FP
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor