+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 8, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 22, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 29, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1589-1600
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On September 24, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1536-1575
On June 30, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 988-992
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1159
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Amendments (20)
+ − Votes (30)
September 25, 2013: House Appropriations Vote: House Bill 618 - Re-report Bill As Committed
September 25, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 2371, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI
September 25, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 2371, FP
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, TRUITT
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1859, TRUITT
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, TRUITT
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1861, TRUITT
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1864, TRUITT
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2061, MOLCHANY
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1839, ROEBUCK
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2440, CONKLIN
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1836, ROEBUCK
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1938, MAHER
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1830, HARKINS
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2597, LONGIETTI
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2076, LONGIETTI
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2596, LONGIETTI
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1832, LONGIETTI
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2935, AUMENT
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1939, MAHER
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A2029, TAYLOR
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1837, SANTARSIERO
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1838, CARROLL
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1882, STURLA
September 24, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 618 PN 1917, 2013 A1860, MOT RECON, BROOKS
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor