+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Vote
June 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 596 PN 642, FP
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor