+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (47-0)
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 3705
On September 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (107-86)
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
- Amended in House Committee on RULES
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (45-3)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
- Second consideration
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Votes (5)
September 28, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 568 PN 3949, 2015 A10372, SUSP RULES, VITALI
September 28, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 568 PN 3949, MOT RECOM LABOR, GALLOWAY
September 28, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 568 PN 3949, CONCUR
July 11, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 568 PN 3705, FINAL PASSAGE
March 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 568 PN 638, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor