+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 6
- Approved by the Governor
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 95
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 561 PN 634, FINAL PASSAGE
June 28, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 561 PN 634, FP
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor