+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (185-12)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Vote
April 16, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 561 PN 560, FP
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor