+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 125
- Approved by the Governor
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2244
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Votes (6)
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 546 PN 2595, CONCUR
December 10, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 546 PN 2595, FINAL PASSAGE
October 23, 2013: Senate Finance Vote: House Bill 546 - Reported as Amended
March 13, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 546 PN 580, FP
February 6, 2013: House Finance Vote: House Bill 546 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor