+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 24, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 98
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- In the House
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- House concurred in Senate amendments (181-0)
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
On October 16, 2018 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 4, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On December 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (187-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1307-1308
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1265-1266
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1228-1230
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
October 17, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 4273, CONCUR
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 4273, FINAL PASSAGE
December 5, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 2193, FP
June 29, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 710, 2017 A2257, LONGIETTI
June 28, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 710, 2017 A1763, MAHER
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor