+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 457
- Third consideration and final passage (187-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 414-416
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 3018, FP
March 22, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 960, 2015 A4738, MOUL
March 22, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 544 PN 960, 2015 A4993, LONGIETTI
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor