+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
- Re-committed to RULES
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On December 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (40-10)
- Re-reported as amended
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 356-363
- Third consideration and final passage (118-78)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 306-321
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (13)
December 10, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 2658, FINAL PASSAGE
March 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, MOT RECOM, BARBIN
March 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, FP
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A267, ROEBUCK
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A201, LONGIETTI
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A259, PASHINSKI
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A255, LONGIETTI
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A264, STURLA
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A254, LONGIETTI
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A249, ROEBUCK
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A250, LONGIETTI
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 530 PN 569, 2015 A247, MULLERY
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor