+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 7, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 75 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1265-1266
- House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
September 28, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 523 PN 1822, CONCUR
September 27, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: HB 523 PN 1822, Final Passage
April 6, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 523 PN 1021, FP
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor