+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 14, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 523 PN 2576, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor