+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 325
- Third consideration and final passage (162-34)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 298-299
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 522 PN 987, FP
March 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 522 PN 861, 2019 A170, LONGIETTI
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor