+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 437-443
- Third consideration and final passage (143-58)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 400 - 403
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 521 PN 1143, MOT CONST, MILLER, D.
April 6, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 521 PN 1143, FP
April 5, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 521 PN 1020, 2021 A600, KLUNK
April 5, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 521 PN 1020, 2021 A605, HOHENSTEIN
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor