+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 3, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 128
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (183-7)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Re-reported as committed
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (169-25)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Votes (3)
October 26, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 516 PN 4043, CONCUR
October 25, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 516 PN 4043, FINAL PASSAGE
April 22, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 516 PN 1053, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor