+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 8, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (190-2)
- In the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 494
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 508 PN 1500, FP
April 19, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 508 PN 609, 2017 A719, KAUFER
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor