+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 480-481
- Third consideration and final passage (193-4)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 9, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 505 PN 493, FP
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor